Hanif Bali (Mod)
Tidigare riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Moderate Party
- Constituency
- Stockholm County
- Title
- Webbutvecklare.
- Birth year
- 1987
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2010-10-4 – 2022-9-26
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2019-9-24
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2016-6-7
- Member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2016-6-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-8
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-8
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-8
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2019-2-27 – 2019-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2019-2-14 – 2019-2-26
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-9 – 2019-2-13
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 10-. Ledamot arbetsmarknadsutskottet 10-16 och näringsutskottet 16-18. Suppleant utbildningsutskottet 10-18, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 18- och EU-nämnden 18-.
Föräldrar
Said Bali och Marzieh Rezai.
Utbildning
Gymnasieskola, Upplands Väsby 03-06.
Anställningar
Säljare, God El 06. Webbmaster, Moderata Ungdomsförbundet 06-07. Webbutvecklare, Moderaterna 07-08. Webbutvecklare, Moderaterna i Stockholm 08-10.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Upplands Väsby 06-07. Kommunfullmäktig, Solna 14- och ersättare 10-14. Ledamot, barn- och utbildningsnämnden, Upplands Väsby 05. Ledamot, tekniska nämnden, Upplands Väsby 06-07. Ledamot, miljönämnden, Solna 08-10. Ledamot, stadsbyggnadsnämnden, Solna 14-.
Bostadsort
Solna
Said and done
Here you will find what the member has said and done in the Riksdag. This can apply to motions, speeches in the chamber or interpellations and written questions to the government. Here you will also find what the government's ministers have said and done in the Riksdag. Use the filters to find among the documents.
Representationen i framtidsministerns analysgrupper
Skriftlig fråga 2014/15:398 av Hanif Bali (M)
Fråga 2014/15:398 Representationen i framtidsministerns analysgrupper av Hanif Bali M till Statsrådet Kristina Persson S Nu tar vi viktiga steg på väg mot ett hållbart samhällesäger framtidsminister Kristina Persson om sina tre tillsatta analysgrupper. De tre områdena är grön omställning, global utmaning och arbete i- Inlämnad
- 2015-04-08
- Besvarare
- Kristina Persson (S)