Maria Arnholm (Lib)
Tidigare riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Liberal Party
- Constituency
- Stockholm County
- Birth year
- 1958
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2014-10-4 – 2020-1-31
- Off duty
- 2014-9-29 – 2014-10-3
The Liberal Party
- Party Secretary
- 2014-10-3 – 2019-6-28
Committee on Education
- Member
- 2019-9-5 – 2019-11-15
Committee on the Labour Market
- Member
- 2019-11-15 – 2020-1-31
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-5 – 2014-11-19
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-5 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-5 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2020-1-31
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-9
The War Delegation
- Member
- 2018-10-9 – 2019-9-5
Council for Members' Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-10 – 2018-12-12
- Minister
- 2013-1-21 – 2014-10-3
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 14-. Ledamot utbildningsutskottet 19-. Suppleant finansutskottet 14-18, socialförsäkringsutskottet 14, näringsutskottet 14-18, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 14-18, EU-nämnden 18, trafikutskottet 18, civilutskottet 18, skatteutskottet 18 och kulturutskottet 18-. Ledamot krigsdelegationen 18-. Suppleant ledamotsrådet 18. Statsråd (jämställdhetsminister och biträdande utbildningsminister), Utbildningsdepartementet 130121-141003.
Said and done
Here you will find what the member has said and done in the Riksdag. This can apply to motions, speeches in the chamber or interpellations and written questions to the government. Here you will also find what the government's ministers have said and done in the Riksdag. Use the filters to find among the documents.
Barnomsorg och delad vårdnad
Interpellation 2012/13:388 av Adolfsson Elgestam, Carina (S)
den 24 april Interpellation 2012/13:388 Barnomsorg och delad vårdnad av Carina Adolfsson Elgestam S till statsrådet Maria Arnholm FP Regeringen säger sig bedriva en arbetslinjeRegeringens arbetslinje säger att om du är arbetslös och du blir erbjuden ett arbete någonstans i Sverige så måste du ta det, oavsett var- Inlämnad
- 2013-04-24
- Besvarare
- Maria Arnholm (FP)
Ökade löneskillnader mellan kvinnor och män
Interpellation 2012/13:230 av Fridolin, Gustav (MP)
den 25 januari Interpellation 2012/13:230 Ökade löneskillnader mellan kvinnor och män av Gustav Fridolin MP till statsrådet Maria Arnholm FP Riksdagen beslutade våren 2006 om mål för jämställdhetspolitiken. Dessa mål säger att kvinnor och män ska ha samma makt att forma samhället och sitt eget liv, samt att alla- Inlämnad
- 2013-01-25
- Besvarare
- Maria Arnholm (FP)