Robert Stenkvist (SweDem)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Sweden Democrats
- Constituency
- Stockholm County, seat 114
- Title
- Fritidspedagog.
- Birth year
- 1958
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Education
Member
Committee on European Union Affairs
Deputy member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2014-9-30 – 2026-9-21
Committee on Education
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2015-4-24 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2015-4-24
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2020-9-3
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Joint Committee on Foreign Affairs and Defence
- Deputy member
- 2018-5-15 – 2018-6-14
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-9 –
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 14–. Ledamot utbildningsutskottet 15–. Suppleant försvarsutskottet 14–18, utbildningsutskottet 14–15, sammansatta utrikes- och försvarsutskottet 18 samt EU-nämnden 18–.
Föräldrar
Stig Stenkvist och Ingrid Löfström.
Utbildning
Fritidspedagogutbildning, Mitthögskolan.
Anställningar
Fritidspedagog, Östersunds kommun och Botkyrka kommun. Vårdbiträde. Arbete vid flyttfirma m.m.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Botkyrka. Styrelsesuppleant, Botkyrkabyggen.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Ordförande, Sverigedemokraterna i Botkyrka. Ordförande, kommunförening, Södertälje 16. Valberedare, Sverigedemokraterna. Ledamot Rifos styrelse, Uvens bågskytteförening, SD Stockholms läns distriktsstyrelse samt KF Botkyrka.