Sten Bergheden (Mod)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Moderate Party
- Constituency
- Västra Götaland County East, seat 45
- Birth year
- 1965
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
- Telephone
- 08-786 46 08
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Transport and Communications
Member
Committee on Justice
Deputy member
Council for Members' Affairs
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2006-11-16 – 2026-9-21
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2019-2-13 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2019-2-12
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
- Member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
- Member
- 2008-5-15 – 2010-10-4
- Deputy member
- 2006-12-1 – 2008-5-15
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2006-12-1 – 2010-10-4
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2010-11-17 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2015-12-10 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2019-6-17
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2019-2-13 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
Council for Members' Affairs
- Member
- 2022-12-14 –
- Deputy member
- 2021-2-22 – 2022-10-10
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 06–. Ledamot trafikutskottet 08–. Suppleant utbildningsutskottet 06–10, trafikutskottet 06–08, näringsutskottet 10–18, miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 15–18, finansutskottet 18–19 och justitieutskottet 19–. Ledamot ledamotsrådet 22–.